Senate
|
12/07/2023
|
Published 12-7-2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/07/2023
|
Report approved by the Governor on 12-6-2023. 2023 Wisconsin Act 46
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/30/2023
|
Presented to the Governor on 11-30-2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/20/2023
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/20/2023
|
LRB correction
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2023
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from Senate message and take up
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Read
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Senate Amendment 2 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
Placed on calendar 9-14-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2023
|
Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2023
|
Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Tomczyk
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Tomczyk
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Senator James added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|