House
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 21, Noes 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Senate Amendment 2 adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Senate Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Stafsholt
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/11/2023
|
Representative Callahan added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/15/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/15/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Housing, Rural Issues and Forestry, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/15/2023
|
Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Housing, Rural Issues and Forestry, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/15/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/19/2023
|
Representative Zimmerman added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2023
|
Senator Ballweg added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stafsholt
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Representative Allen added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Housing, Rural Issues and Forestry
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|