Senate
|
12/07/2023
|
Published 12-7-2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/07/2023
|
Report approved by the Governor on 12-6-2023. 2023 Wisconsin Act 74
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/30/2023
|
Presented to the Governor on 11-30-2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/13/2023
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from Senate message and take up
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Read
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Senator Agard added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/03/2023
|
Placed on calendar 11-7-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/10/2023
|
Representative Drake added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/10/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/10/2023
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/06/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/03/2023
|
Representative Snodgrass added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/27/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2023
|
Representative Conley added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2023
|
Representative Ratcliff added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2023
|
Representative Joers added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2023
|
Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2023
|
Representative Madison added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|