Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Representative Neubauer added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Report of Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions received | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Universities and Revenue, Ayes 8, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Report of Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions requested | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Representative Andraca added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 12/21/2023 | Representative Edming added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 11/27/2023 | Representative Magnafici added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 10/23/2023 | Representative Kurtz added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 09/06/2023 | Representative Conley added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 08/29/2023 | Representative Ratcliff added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 08/24/2023 | Representative C. Anderson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 08/15/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 06/20/2023 | Representative Billings added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Revenue | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Introduced |