Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Published 3-28-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 3-27-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 245
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-21-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-15-2024 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Report concurrence recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 13, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Representative Madison added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on State Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Placed on calendar 3-22-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 8, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|