House
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Representative Andraca added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Report concurrence as amended recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 9, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 9, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Krug
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Campaigns and Elections
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/16/2023
|
Placed on calendar 10-17-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/04/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/04/2023
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/26/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2023
|
Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Senator Spreitzer added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Representative Krug added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|