Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2023
|
Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Laid on table
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Senator Spreitzer added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Placed on the foot of the 11th order of business on the calendar of 6-14-2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Representatives Jacobson, Cabrera, Conley and Haywood added as cosponsors
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Placed on calendar 6-14-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Fiscal estimate requested from the Legislative Fiscal Bureau, pursuant to Senate Rule 96 (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2023
|
Representative Bare added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Quinn
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Housing, Rural Issues and Forestry, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Housing, Rural Issues and Forestry, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Representative Snodgrass added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Quinn
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Representative Magnafici added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Representative VanderMeer added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Representative Krug added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Housing, Rural Issues and Forestry
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|