Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 06/19/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 06/16/2023 | Representatives Subeck and Emerson added as cosponsors | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | Laid on table | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | Placed on the foot of the 11th order of business on the calendar of 6-14-2023 | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | Representative Haywood added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | Senators Taylor and Spreitzer added as coauthors | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | LRB correction (Senate Amendment 1) | ||
Senate | 06/13/2023 | Placed on calendar 6-14-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 06/12/2023 | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stroebel | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Housing, Rural Issues and Forestry, Ayes 4, Noes 1 | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | Representative Magnafici added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Housing, Rural Issues and Forestry | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Introduced |