Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Referred to committee on Administrative Rules | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Read a second time | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Placed on calendar 3-22-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Report without recommendation pursuant to s. 227.26 (2)(h), Wisconsin Statutes | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Joint Committee for Review of Administrative Rules report received pursuant to s. 227.26(2)(g), Wisconsin Statutes | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Administrative Rules | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Introduced |