Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Licensing, Constitution and Federalism, Ayes 3, Noes 2 | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Licensing, Constitution and Federalism, Ayes 3, Noes 2 | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque | ||
Senate | 09/19/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 08/29/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Licensing, Constitution and Federalism | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Introduced |