Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 09/25/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 06/13/2023 | Report passage, with emergency statement attached, pursuant to s. 16.47 (2), Wisconsin Statutes, recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 10, Noes 4 | ||
Senate | 06/13/2023 | Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) | ||
Senate | 06/13/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 06/13/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 06/12/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection, Ayes 3, Noes 2 | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senators Spreitzer and Smith | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Spreitzer and Smith | ||
Senate | 05/26/2023 | Report of Joint Survey Committee on Retirement Systems received | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | LRB correction | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Report of Joint Survey Committee on Retirement Systems requested | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Report of Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions requested | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Introduced |