Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 11/29/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 11/29/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 11/28/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 11/10/2023 | Representative Emerson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 11/02/2023 | Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 11/01/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 11/01/2023 | Senator Cabral-Guevara added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 10/30/2023 | Senator L. Johnson added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 08/29/2023 | Representative Ratcliff added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 07/18/2023 | Representative Madison added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Introduced |