Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 03/01/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 10/24/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 10/24/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 2 | ||
Senate | 10/24/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 09/27/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 07/19/2023 | Senator Knodl added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Introduced |