House
|
05/15/2024
|
Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Placed on calendar 5-15-2024 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a)
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Received from Senate passed notwithstanding the objections of the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Passed notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, Ayes 22, Noes 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Rules suspended and taken up
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
Placed on calendar 5-14-2024 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Report vetoed by the Governor on 4-9-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 4-4-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 62, Noes 35
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 61, Noes 35
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Shankland and Billings
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 61, Noes 35
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Shankland and Billings
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Made a special order of business at 10:13 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
LRB correction
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Passed, Ayes 22, Noes 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Read a third time
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Senate Substitute Amendment 2 adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Senate Amendment 2 to Senate Substitute Amendment 2 rejected, Ayes 21, Noes 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 2 adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Senate Amendment 2 to Senate Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Senators Pfaff, Wirch, Hesselbein, Agard, Carpenter, L. Johnson, Larson, Smith, Spreitzer and Taylor
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Placed on the foot of the 14th order of business on the calendar of 11-14-2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Senate Substitute Amendment 3 offered by Senators Pfaff, Wirch, Hesselbein, Agard, Carpenter, L. Johnson, Larson, Smith, Spreitzer and Taylor
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/13/2023
|
Placed on calendar 11-14-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Senators Wimberger and Cowles
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/12/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/12/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 3, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/12/2023
|
Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 3, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/11/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/10/2023
|
Senate Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Senators Wimberger and Cowles
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/19/2023
|
Senator Knodl added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2023
|
Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senators Wimberger and Cowles
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|