Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Published 3-22-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 3-21-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 154
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-18-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Made a special order of business at 10:14 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 33, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
Placed on calendar 9-14-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2023
|
Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2023
|
Senator Spreitzer added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator James
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/19/2023
|
Senator Knodl added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Representative Sinicki added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|