Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Representative Conley withdrawn as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 11/09/2023 | LRB correction | ||
Senate | 11/08/2023 | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Hutton | ||
Senate | 07/19/2023 | Senator Knodl added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor, Regulatory Reform, Veterans and Military Affairs | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Introduced |