Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 12/28/2023 | Representative O'Connor added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 10/11/2023 | LRB correction | ||
Senate | 10/04/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 07/10/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 06/23/2023 | Senator Wimberger added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | Introduced |