House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 10/17/2023 | Received from Senate | ||
Senate | 10/17/2023 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
Senate | 10/17/2023 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 20, Noes 12 | ||
Senate | 10/17/2023 | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading | ||
Senate | 10/17/2023 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
Senate | 10/17/2023 | Senate Amendment 1 adopted | ||
Senate | 10/17/2023 | Read a second time | ||
Senate | 10/16/2023 | Placed on calendar 10-17-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 10/12/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 10/12/2023 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 2 | ||
Senate | 10/12/2023 | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 2 | ||
Senate | 10/12/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 10/10/2023 | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque | ||
Senate | 09/05/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | Introduced |