Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 11/09/2023 | Representative O'Connor added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 11/08/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 11/08/2023 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 11/08/2023 | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 11/08/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 11/06/2023 | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Knodl | ||
Senate | 08/29/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 08/15/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | Introduced |