Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Representative Neubauer added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 07/18/2023 | Representative Madison added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 07/17/2023 | Commissioner of Insurance report received pursuant to s.601.423(2), Wisconsin Statutes | ||
Senate | 06/23/2023 | Representative Murphy withdrawn as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 06/21/2023 | Representative Riemer added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 06/21/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance and Small Business | ||
Senate | 06/21/2023 | Introduced |