House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 10/17/2023 | Received from Senate | ||
Senate | 10/17/2023 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
Senate | 10/17/2023 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 22, Noes 10 | ||
Senate | 10/17/2023 | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading | ||
Senate | 10/17/2023 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
Senate | 10/17/2023 | Read a second time | ||
Senate | 10/16/2023 | Placed on calendar 10-17-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 10/09/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 10/09/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Licensing, Constitution and Federalism, Ayes 3, Noes 2 | ||
Senate | 10/09/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 09/19/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 06/21/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Licensing, Constitution and Federalism | ||
Senate | 06/21/2023 | Introduced |