House
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 20, Noes 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Senate Substitute Amendment 1 rejected, Ayes 21, Noes 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senators Roys, Agard, Carpenter, Hesselbein, L. Johnson, Larson, Pfaff, Smith, Spreitzer, Wirch and Taylor
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/03/2023
|
Placed on calendar 11-7-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/31/2023
|
Report of Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions received
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/27/2023
|
Representative Duchow added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/12/2023
|
Report of Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/09/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/09/2023
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Licensing, Constitution and Federalism, Ayes 3, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/09/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/19/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/19/2023
|
Senator Knodl added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Licensing, Constitution and Federalism
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|