House
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 24, Noes 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Senate Amendment 2 rejected, Ayes 22, Noes 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Senator Wanggaard added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senators Roys, L. Johnson, Pfaff, Spreitzer, Agard, Carpenter, Hesselbein, Larson and Smith
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/16/2023
|
Placed on calendar 10-17-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/09/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/09/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Licensing, Constitution and Federalism, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/09/2023
|
Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Licensing, Constitution and Federalism, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/09/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/02/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Quinn
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/19/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/07/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Licensing, Constitution and Federalism
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|