Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 11/21/2023 | Representative Schutt added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 10/23/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 07/19/2023 | Representative Goeben added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 07/14/2023 | Senator Quinn added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 06/29/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture and Tourism | ||
Senate | 06/29/2023 | Introduced |