Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 12/07/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 09/20/2023 | Representative Madison added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 09/15/2023 | Representative Hong added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 08/09/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 07/14/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 06/29/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health | ||
Senate | 06/29/2023 | Introduced |