Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Published 3-22-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 3-21-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 141
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-18-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
LRB correction
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 94, Noes 2
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from Senate message and take up
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Read
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 32, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Report of Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions received
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Report of Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Report passage recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 13, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c)
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/20/2023
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Universities and Revenue, Ayes 8, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/05/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/27/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/17/2023
|
Representative Rozar added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2023
|
Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2023
|
Senator Spreitzer added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Revenue
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|