Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2024 | Senator Pfaff added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Representative Emerson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 08/24/2023 | Senator Wirch added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 07/17/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 06/29/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Revenue | ||
Senate | 06/29/2023 | Introduced |