Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Laid on table
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Placed on the foot of the 11th order of business on the calendar of 10-17-2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/16/2023
|
Placed on calendar 10-17-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/26/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/26/2023
|
Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/26/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/26/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/22/2023
|
Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Universities and Revenue, Ayes 8, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2023
|
Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Universities and Revenue, Ayes 8, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2023
|
Representative Joers added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Hutton
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2023
|
Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/27/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Revenue
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|