Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Taylor | ||
Senate | 11/09/2023 | Representatives O'Connor and Cabrera added as cosponsors | ||
Senate | 11/08/2023 | Representative Penterman added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 11/08/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 07/13/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection | ||
Senate | 07/13/2023 | Introduced |