Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Representative Neubauer added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 10/05/2023 | Representative Stubbs added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 09/12/2023 | Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) | ||
Senate | 08/31/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 08/31/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture and Tourism, Ayes 8, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 08/30/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 08/18/2023 | Representative Joers added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 08/07/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 07/27/2023 | Representative Kitchens added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 07/27/2023 | Representative Mursau added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 07/27/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 07/20/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture and Tourism | ||
Senate | 07/20/2023 | Introduced |