Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Published 3-15-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 3-14-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 118
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-11-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Representative Emerson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from Senate message and take up
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Read
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Placed on calendar 1-16-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/29/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/29/2023
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/28/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/01/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Representative Madison added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/23/2023
|
Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2023
|
Representative C. Anderson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2023
|
Representative Clancy added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2023
|
Representative Palmeri added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|