Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 10/24/2023 | Representative Madison added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 09/19/2023 | Representative Mursau added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 09/15/2023 | Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 09/08/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 08/22/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 08/21/2023 | Representative Joers added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 08/09/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Revenue | ||
Senate | 08/09/2023 | Introduced |