Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Representative Joers added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/05/2023
|
Representative Drake added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/04/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/04/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/04/2023
|
Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/03/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/26/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2023
|
Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Cabral-Guevara
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2023
|
Withdrawn from committee on Government Operations and rereferred to committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Cabral-Guevara
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Representative Conley added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Elections and Consumer Protection
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|