Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Published 3-22-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 3-21-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 142
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-18-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 92, Noes 6
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Representative Emerson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Report concurrence recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Senator Cowles added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Read first time and referred to joint committee on Finance
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 30, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Senate Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Placed on calendar 1-16-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/20/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/20/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Universities and Revenue, Ayes 8, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/20/2023
|
Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Universities and Revenue, Ayes 8, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/18/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Hutton
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/05/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Representative Conley added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2023
|
Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Revenue
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|