Wisconsin 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Wisconsin Senate Bill SB398 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    Wisconsin Legislative Council 
AMENDMENT MEMO 
One Ea st Ma in Stre e t, Suite 401 • Ma dison, W I 53703 • (608) 266-1304 • le g.council@le gis.wisconsin.gov • http://www.le gis.wisconsin.gov/lc 
Memo published: January 12, 2024 	Contact: Brian Larson, Senior Staff Attorney 
2023 Senate Bill 398 Senate Amendment 1 
2023 SENATE BILL 398 
2023 Senate Bill 398 creates a nonrefundable tax credit for certain transportation costs paid by a 
person who is considered blind as defined by the Internal Revenue Code. The credit may be claimed for 
taxable years beginning after December 31, 2022. 
SENATE AMENDMENT 1 
Senate Amendment 1 modifies when the credit may be claimed to taxable years beginning after 
December 31, 2023. The credit may initially be claimed in the 2024 tax year. 
BILL HISTORY 
Senate Amendment 1 was offered by Senator Hutton on December 18, 2023. The Senate Committee on 
Universities and Revenue recommended both the adoption of Senate Amendment 1, and passage of 
Senate Bill 518, as amended, by votes of Ayes, 8; Noes, 0; on December 20, 2023. 
For a full history of the bill, visit the Legislature’s bill history page. 
BL:ksm