Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/14/2023
|
Senator James added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Representatives Cabrera, C. Anderson, Conley, Jacobson and Haywood added as cosponsors
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Representative O'Connor added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2023
|
Representative Bare added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Housing, Rural Issues and Forestry, Ayes 4, Noes 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Housing, Rural Issues and Forestry, Ayes 4, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Housing, Rural Issues and Forestry, Ayes 4, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Representative Snodgrass added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Feyen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Senator Ballweg added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Feyen
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Representative Callahan added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Representative Summerfield added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Housing, Rural Issues and Forestry
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|