Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Agriculture and Tourism, Ayes 8, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Agriculture and Tourism, Ayes 8, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | Senate Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Senator Cowles | ||
Senate | 12/11/2023 | Senator Cabral-Guevara withdrawn as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 11/03/2023 | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Cowles | ||
Senate | 09/27/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 09/27/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 09/08/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture and Tourism | ||
Senate | 09/08/2023 | Introduced |