Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Published 3-15-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 3-14-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 112
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-11-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Made a special order of business at 10:18 AM on 1-25-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 23
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Placed on calendar 1-16-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2024
|
Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/06/2023
|
Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator James
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/21/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2023
|
Representatives Bodden, Gustafson and Behnke added as cosponsors
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2023
|
Senator Ballweg added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Sporting Heritage
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|