Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Representative Emerson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 10/24/2023 | Representative Madison added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 10/13/2023 | Representative C. Anderson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 09/21/2023 | Representative Palmeri added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 09/20/2023 | Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 09/08/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 09/08/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety | ||
Senate | 09/08/2023 | Introduced |