Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 09/25/2023 | Representative C. Anderson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 09/15/2023 | Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Representative O'Connor added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Representative Rettinger added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture and Tourism | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Introduced |