Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Representative Emerson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families, Ayes 3, Noes 2 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 10/18/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 09/20/2023 | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator James | ||
Senate | 09/20/2023 | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator James | ||
Senate | 09/12/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 09/08/2023 | LRB correction | ||
Senate | 09/08/2023 | Representative Kitchens added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 09/08/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families | ||
Senate | 09/08/2023 | Introduced |