Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 10/18/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 10/17/2023 | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Ballweg | ||
Senate | 10/17/2023 | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Ballweg | ||
Senate | 09/20/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 09/08/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families | ||
Senate | 09/08/2023 | Introduced |