Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Representative Neubauer added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 10/05/2023 | Representative Schutt added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 10/05/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 10/03/2023 | Representative Hong added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 09/28/2023 | Representative Billings added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 09/27/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 09/08/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 09/08/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor, Regulatory Reform, Veterans and Military Affairs | ||
Senate | 09/08/2023 | Introduced |