Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 12/12/2023 | Senator Taylor added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 12/07/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 12/07/2023 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Insurance and Small Business, Ayes 4, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 12/07/2023 | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Insurance and Small Business, Ayes 4, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 12/06/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 10/05/2023 | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Felzkowski | ||
Senate | 09/21/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 09/20/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 09/15/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance and Small Business | ||
Senate | 09/15/2023 | Introduced |