Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Representative Joers added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 11/08/2023 | Representative Emerson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 10/18/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 10/18/2023 | Senator Testin added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 10/18/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 10/05/2023 | Representative Hurd added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 09/20/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Housing, Rural Issues and Forestry | ||
Senate | 09/20/2023 | Introduced |