Senate | 03/28/2024 | Published 3-28-2024 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Report approved by the Governor on 3-27-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 246 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Presented to the Governor on 3-21-2024 | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | Report correctly enrolled | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | LRB correction | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Received from Assembly concurred in | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Read a third time and concurred in | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Rules suspended to withdraw from Senate message and take up | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Read | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Received from Senate | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Read a third time and passed | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Read a second time | ||
Senate | 01/12/2024 | Placed on calendar 1-16-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 12/19/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 09/20/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Sporting Heritage | ||
Senate | 09/20/2023 | Introduced |