Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Published 3-22-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 3-21-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 134
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-18-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Report concurrence recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 14, Noes 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Read first time and referred to joint committee on Finance
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 32, Noes 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Placed on the foot of the 14th order of business on the calendar of 11-14-2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/13/2023
|
Placed on calendar 11-14-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/10/2023
|
Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Ballweg
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/12/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/12/2023
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture and Tourism, Ayes 8, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/12/2023
|
Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/27/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/27/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/20/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture and Tourism
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/20/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|