Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Published 4-5-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 4-4-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 269
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 4-1-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Placed on calendar 1-16-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/05/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/06/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/16/2023
|
Representative Ratcliff added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/21/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/21/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|