Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 11/02/2023 | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator James | ||
Senate | 11/02/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 11/02/2023 | Senator Wanggaard added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 10/24/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 10/17/2023 | Representative Stubbs added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 09/29/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety | ||
Senate | 09/29/2023 | Introduced |