Senate
|
03/29/2024
|
Published 3-30-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 3-29-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 249
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-26-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
LRB correction (Senate Amendment 1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
LRB correction
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Representative Ratcliff added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Action ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Received from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in as amended, Ayes 97, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Representative Emerson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-15-2024 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Moses
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Representative Ohnstad added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Representative Bare added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Representative Plumer added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Senators Carpenter and Hesselbein added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Placed on the foot of the 14th order of business on the calendar of 11-14-2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/13/2023
|
Placed on calendar 11-14-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/01/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/31/2023
|
Representative Magnafici added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/30/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/30/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Marklein
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2023
|
Representative Conley added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Representative Joers added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2023
|
Representative Duchow added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/16/2023
|
Representatives Stubbs and Steffen added as cosponsors
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/12/2023
|
Senator Stafsholt added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/29/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/29/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|